NY A09269 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the county of Albany to impose an additional ninety-five cent surcharge per access line per month on the customers of every wireless service supplier within Albany county to pay for costs associated with maintaining the 911 emergency telephone system.
Title
Allows for the county of Albany to impose an additional ninety-five cent surcharge per access line per month on the customers of every wireless service supplier within Albany county to pay for costs associated with maintaining the 911 emergency telephone system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.259 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1558 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8246A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.471 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.471 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 9269a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08246 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9269A
A09233 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - enacting clause stricken
A09233 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - enacting clause stricken