NY S08246 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9269A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9269A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the county of Albany to impose an additional ninety-five cent surcharge per access line per month on the customers of every wireless service supplier within Albany county to pay for costs associated with maintaining the 911 emergency telephone system.
Title
Allows for the county of Albany to impose an additional ninety-five cent surcharge per access line per month on the customers of every wireless service supplier within Albany county to pay for costs associated with maintaining the 911 emergency telephone system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9269A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1558 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8246A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |