NY A09131 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York State Department of Labor to establish a voluntary training and certification program for employers entitled the Neurodiversity Training Pledge.
Title
Directs the New York State Department of Labor to establish a voluntary training and certification program for employers entitled the Neurodiversity Training Pledge.
Sponsors
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] |
Asm. Juan Ardila [D] | Asm. Keith Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | print number 9131b |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | print number 9131a |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08797 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means