NY S08797 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York State Department of Labor to establish a voluntary training and certification program for employers entitled the Neurodiversity Training Pledge.
Title
Directs the New York State Department of Labor to establish a voluntary training and certification program for employers entitled the Neurodiversity Training Pledge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1890 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8797B |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8797A |
2024-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09131 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - reported referred to rules