NY A08465 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - amended on third reading 8465a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - amended on third reading 8465a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitted deductions from wages.
Title
Relates to permitted deductions from wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8465a |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.295 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.589 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.589 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05786 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5786A
S07790 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10785
A10785 (Same As) 2012-09-07 - signed chap.451
S07790 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10785
A10785 (Same As) 2012-09-07 - signed chap.451