NY A10785 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - signed chap.451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitted deductions from wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitted deductions from wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-07Senatesigned chap.451
2012-08-27Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1427
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7790
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.531
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.531
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S07790 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10785
A08465 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - amended on third reading 8465a
S05786 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5786A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback