NY S05786 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5786A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5786A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitted deductions from wages.
Title
Relates to permitted deductions from wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5786A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-06-24 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1364 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08465 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - amended on third reading 8465a
S07790 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10785
A10785 (Same As) 2012-09-07 - signed chap.451
S07790 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10785
A10785 (Same As) 2012-09-07 - signed chap.451