NY A08290 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-1)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 8290a
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 8290a
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New York public banking act"; authorizes municipal and other local governments to form and control public banks through the ownership of capital stock or other ownership interests, and to loan or grant public funds or lend public credit to such public banks for the public purposes of achieving cost savings, strengthening local economies, supporting community economic development, and addressing infrastructure and housing needs for localities.
Title
Establishes the "New York public banking act"; authorizes municipal and other local governments to form and control public banks through the ownership of capital stock or other ownership interests, and to loan or grant public funds or lend public credit to such public banks for the public purposes of achieving cost savings, strengthening local economies, supporting community economic development, and addressing infrastructure and housing needs for localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 8290a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2021-10-06 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S01762 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1762B