NY A07552 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions permanent relating to the one-call notification system.
Title
Makes provisions permanent relating to the one-call notification system.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | signed chap.455 |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1402 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6691 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.146 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06691 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7552