NY S06691 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions permanent relating to the one-call notification system.
Title
Makes provisions permanent relating to the one-call notification system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7552 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07552 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.455