NY A06921 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates that the commissioners of public service shall be elected in a manner to be prescribed by law.
Title
Designates that the commissioners of public service shall be elected in a manner to be prescribed by law.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01713 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY