NY A06042 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - substituted by s3757
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - substituted by s3757
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Wyoming county's authorization to impose a one percent addition to the 3% sales and compensating use tax rates for an additional 2 years through 11/30/2013.
Title
Extends Wyoming county's authorization to impose a one percent addition to the 3% sales and compensating use tax rates for an additional 2 years through 11/30/2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s3757 |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.469 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03757 (Same As) 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.237