NY S03757 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Wyoming county's authorization to impose a one percent addition to the 3% sales and compensating use tax rates for an additional 2 years through 11/30/2013.
Title
Extends Wyoming county's authorization to impose a one percent addition to the 3% sales and compensating use tax rates for an additional 2 years through 11/30/2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.237 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.469 |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a6042 |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.471 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06042 (Same As) 2011-06-01 - substituted by s3757