NV SB37 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174.
Summary
Authorizes the award of subgrants for certain purposes relating to the control of water pollution. (BDR 40-360)
Title
Authorizes the award of subgrants for certain purposes relating to the control of water pollution. (BDR 40-360)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174. | |
2009-05-17 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-03-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-23 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=64 |