NV AB516 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 138.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 138.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the use of money in the Wildlife Account. (BDR 45-708)
Title
Revises provisions governing the use of money in the Wildlife Account. (BDR 45-708)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 138. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-04 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-10 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 273.) To printer. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-10 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=994 |