NV AB253 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.
Summary
Revises the crime of resisting, delaying or obstructing a public officer in the discharge of his duties. (BDR 15-892)
Title
Revises the crime of resisting, delaying or obstructing a public officer in the discharge of his duties. (BDR 15-892)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-24 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-06 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=503 |