NM HJM28 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-2) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-2) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Feral hog eradication team
Title
Feral hog eradication team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Passed Senate (39-2) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-07 | House | [LD 18] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |