NJ S2332 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S491
Note: Carry Over of previous S3091
Note: Carry Over of previous S3091
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns participation in special probation drug court. *
Title
Concerns participation in special probation drug court. *
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2332 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3091 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3755 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3091 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3755 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading