NJ S491 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2332
Note: Carry Over of previous A3755
Note: Carry Over of previous A3755
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Combined with S241 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Combined with S241 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns participation in special probation drug court.
Title
Concerns participation in special probation drug court.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Combined with S241 (SCS) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2332 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2690 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3755 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2690 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3755 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S491 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/491_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S491 |