NJ A3755 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2690
Note: Carry Foward to future S491
Note: Carry Over of previous S3091
Note: Carry Foward to future S491
Note: Carry Over of previous S3091
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special probation drug court eligibility for persons with certain previous criminal convictions.*
Title
Establishes special probation drug court eligibility for persons with certain previous criminal convictions.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3755 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3755 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2332 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3091 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3755 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2332 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3091 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee