NJ A3292 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.
Title
Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.162. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2244 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2) |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2244 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3292 (1R)