NJ S2244 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3292 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3292 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.
Title
Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3292 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3292 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.162.