NJ A1609 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1812
Note: Carry Foward to future S1431
Note: Carry Over of previous A1859
Note: Carry Over of previous S1530
Note: Carry Foward to future S1431
Note: Carry Over of previous A1859
Note: Carry Over of previous S1530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Title
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1609 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1609 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1859 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2129 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1530 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1609 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1859 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2129 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1530 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1609 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1609_I1.HTM |