NJ A1812 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1609
Note: Carry Over of previous S2129
Note: Carry Over of previous S2129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Title
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1609 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2129 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1431 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2129 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1431 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1812 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2000/1812_I1.HTM |