NJ A1859 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1609
Note: Carry Foward to future S2129
Note: Carry Over of previous A4504
Note: Carry Foward to future S2129
Note: Carry Over of previous A4504
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Title
Clarifies that owners of self-driving motor vehicles must comply with existing insurance requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Arthur Barclay [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1859 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1859 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4504 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1530 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1859 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4504 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1530 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee