NH SB342 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school building aid funding.
Title
Relative to school building aid funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 5-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0658s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0658s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0658s, 02/21/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |