LA SB148 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to postpartum depression. (8/1/24) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to postpartum depression. (8/1/24) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 CONCUR (#968) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#1108) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 CO-AUTHORS (#408) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#407) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#1108) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 CO-AUTHORS (#408) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#407) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 301. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2024. |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |