IL HB5561 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Whistleblower Act. Changes the definitions of "employer" and "employee". Defines "adverse employment action", "public body", "retaliatory action", and "supervisor". Provides that an employer may not take retaliatory action against an employee who discloses or threatens to disclose information about an activity, policy, or practice of the employer that the employee has a good faith belief that such activity, policy, or practice violates a State or federal law, rule, or regulation or poses a substantial and specific danger to public health or safety. Includes additional relief, damages, and penalties for violation of the Act. Allows the Attorney General to initiate or intervene in a civil action to obtain appropriate relief if the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that any person or entity is engaged in a practice prohibited by the Act. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to claims arising or complaints filed on or after January 1, 2025. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
WHISTLEBLOWER ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 174 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 20.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 174 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 174 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |