NC H907 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-543
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-543
Summary
Public Campaign Fund Changes.
Title
Public Campaign Fund Changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-543 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Ratified | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H907 |