NC H543 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Ch. SL 2009-208
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Ch. SL 2009-208
Summary
No Penalty for Comm. Coll. Audit Exception.
Title
No Penalty for Comm. Coll. Audit Exception.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Phillip Frye [R] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] | Rep. Cullie Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Joe Tolson [D] | Rep. Ray Warren [D] | Rep. Laura Wiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Ch. SL 2009-208 | |
2009-06-26 | Signed By Gov. 6/26/2009 | |
2009-06-19 | Pres. To Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Ratified | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-11 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-11 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-03-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Community Colleges | |
2009-03-12 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H543 |