NC H1490 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-572
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-572
Summary
Land Development Permit Changes.
Title
Land Development Permit Changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-572 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-08-04 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-20 | Held by Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-06 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S831 (Same As) 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-406
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1490 |