NC H1399 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-134
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-134
Summary
Capacity Use Areas Enforcement.
Title
Capacity Use Areas Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Van Braxton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Ch. SL 2009-134 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed By Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Ratified | |
2009-06-09 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-08 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Com Sub w/o Prejud | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1399 |