NC H1387 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-553
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-553
Summary
Solar Collectors on Residential Properties.
Title
Solar Collectors on Residential Properties.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-553 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Economic Recovery | |
2009-06-29 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1387 |