NC H1160 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-567
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-567
Summary
Fire and Rescue Pension Fund Additions.
Title
Fire and Rescue Pension Fund Additions.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Daniel Goforth [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-567 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2009-07-22 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-07 | Serial referral to Finance is stricken. | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1160 |