NC H1111 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-534
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-534
Summary
Campaign Finance Amendments.
Title
Campaign Finance Amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-534 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Amendment Ruled Out of Order 1 | |
2009-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1111 |