MS HR75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Mourning The Loss And Recognizing The Courage, Bravery And Valiant Service Of Sergeant C.b. Mclemore During World War Ii And As A Mississippi Highway Patrolman For 32 Years.
Title
Sergeant C.B. McLemore; mourn the loss and commend his life and service upon his passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred To Rules |