MS HR31 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating William And Cala Tabb Upon The Distinct Honor Of Being Named National And State Young Farmers And Ranchers Achievement Award Recipients.
Title
William and Cala Tabb; commend upon the distinct honor of being named state and national Young Farmers and Ranchers Achievement Award recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] | Rep. Charles Beckett [R] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] | Rep. Karl Oliver [R] |
Rep. Ashley Henley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-24 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred To Rules |