MS HC67 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Ripley High School Lady Tigers Basketball Team Upon Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 4a State Basketball Championship.
Title
Ripley High School Girls basketball team; commend for winning MHSAA Class 4A State Basketball Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-05-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |