MO SB426 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 426-Wasson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 426-Wasson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies property tax exemptions for property located in enhanced enterprise zones
Title
Modifies property tax exemptions for property located in enhanced enterprise zones
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 426-Wasson, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (1714S.03C) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 426-Wasson |