MO SB419 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 419-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 419-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires inclusion of information on traffic stops and constitutional rights in driver training programs and information provided to first-time license recipients
Title
Requires inclusion of information on traffic stops and constitutional rights in driver training programs and information provided to first-time license recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 419-Riddle |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 419-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59880644 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB419.pdf |