MO SB316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 316-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 316-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to password protection
Title
Creates new provisions relating to password protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 316-Rowden, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1356S.02C) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 316-Rowden |