MO SB263 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 263-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 263-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires licensed chiropractors to be reimbursed for the provision of MO HealthNet services
Title
Requires licensed chiropractors to be reimbursed for the provision of MO HealthNet services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 263-Riddle |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 263-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57611597 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB263.pdf |