MO SB201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 201-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 201-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to joint employers
Title
Creates new provisions relating to joint employers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 201-Onder, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0817S.02C) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 201-Onder |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |