MO SB177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 177-Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 177-Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes offenders who owe court costs or restitution, or have not fulfilled certain other conditions, ineligible for early release for earned compliance credits
Title
Makes offenders who owe court costs or restitution, or have not fulfilled certain other conditions, ineligible for early release for earned compliance credits
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 177-Dixon, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0662S.02C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 177-Dixon |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |