MO HJR87 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting appropriations in any fiscal year from exceeding certain limits
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting appropriations in any fiscal year from exceeding certain limits
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Icet [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 1:30P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2010-03-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-24 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 84 NOES: 69 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-24 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 88 NOES: 66 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-22 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |