MO HB544 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from requiring current or prospective employees to provide specified information to gain access to the employee's account or profile on a social networking website
Title
Prohibits employers from requiring current or prospective employees to provide specified information to gain access to the employee's account or profile on a social networking website
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB544&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0544I.PDF |