MN HF3099 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Podiatrist licensure requirement modified.
Title
Podiatrist licensure requirement modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2022-05-12 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3202 |
2022-03-24 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3202 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Second reading