MN SF3202 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Podiatrist licensure requirement modification
Title
Podiatrist licensure requirement modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-12 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3099 |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3099 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed