MD SB943 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring State residential centers and State-operated hospitals to develop a workplace safety plan; establishing certain requirements for a certain workplace safety plan; requiring that certain training address certain risks and include certain instruction on certain matters; requiring certain State residential centers and State-operated hospitals to collaborate with a certain committee for certain purposes; requiring that certain procedures include certain other procedures; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1568 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Guns
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Housing
Injury
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
State Hospitals
Threats
Violence
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Guns
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Housing
Injury
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
State Hospitals
Threats
Violence
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 5 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |