MA S888 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide protection from child enticement. The Judiciary.
Title
Providing protection from child enticement
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S796 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
S886 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H567 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5021
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H738 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3028 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2331 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4486 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4784 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H5021 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Passed to be engrossed
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
S886 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H567 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5021
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H738 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3028 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2331 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4486 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4784 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H5021 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S888.pdf |